Davidson, Christopher Malcolm (CPSO#: 80975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3538
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davidson ( CPSO# 80975 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine- Room 8-207
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MALCOLM DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2010