Davidson, David Brian (CPSO#: 42139)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 2006

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: September 5, 2006
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On September 5, 2006, Dr. David Brian Davidson entered into the following Undertaking with
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

1. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians
and Surgeons of Ontario, no later than 11:59 p.m. on September 30, 2006.

2. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as
a physician or for a license to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

3. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, acknowledge that, in consideration for this
undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario agrees to
withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee for failure to meet the standard
of practice of the profession and incompetence, as alleged in the Notice of
Hearing dated July 11, 2006.

4. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, agree that, in the event that the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either
applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a
physician or for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction, the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to
proceed with a discipline proceeding on the basis of breach of this undertaking
and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the
allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated July 11, 2006.

5. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, hereby agree that should the College of Physicians
and Surgeons of Ontario proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained
in the Notice of Hearing dated July 11, 2006 pursuant to paragraph 4 of this
undertaking, I will bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of time might
cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to seek
any remedy on the basis of the passage of time.

6. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, consent to the terms of this undertaking being
entered on the register as information that is available to the public.