Davidson, Derek Anthony (CPSO#: 19156)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 216, 255 the Donway West, Toronto, ON M3B 3M3
Date Received: 10 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016