Davidson, James Michael (CPSO#: 56118)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998