Davidson, John Scott Douglas (CPSO#: 50364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2117
Fax: (613) 545-0576
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davidson ( CPSO# 50364 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN SCOTT DOUGLAS DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1988