Davidson, Murray (CPSO#: 18851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1963

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1963

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 513
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 766-2365
Fax: (416) 766-2366
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1964