Davierwala, Piroze Minoo (CPSO#: 76694)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Pune, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2004