Davies, Andrew Owen (CPSO#: 23646)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Randhawa ( CPSO# 74322 )
Dr. T. Davies ( CPSO# 77744 )
Dr. A. Davies ( CPSO# 23646 )

Business Address:
Henderson Hospital
Section B3 Room 147
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Records Location

Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre, 50 College Drive, P.O. Box 2500, North Bay, ON P1B 0A4
Date Received: 01 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015