Davies, Angela Margaret (CPSO#: 70071)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 15 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 15 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002