Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Davies, Brian James (CPSO#: 55843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 North Mitton Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H3
Phone: (519) 337-0011
Fax: (519) 337-0522
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Sleep Disorder Clinic
1258 Michigan Avenue
Sarnia ON  N7S 3Y2
Canada
Phone: (519) 332-5333
Fax: (519) 332-5444
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Davies ( CPSO# 55843 )

Business Address:
185 North Mitton Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H3
Phone Number: (519) 337-0011

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Bluewater Sleep Disorder Clinic
1258 Michigan Avenue
Sarnia ON  N7S 3Y2
Phone Number: (519) 332-5333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986