Davies, Campbell David (CPSO#: 70811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Alberta, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's Hospital
3830 Avenue Lacombe
Montreal QC  H3T 1M5
Phone: (514) 345-3511 Ext. 3736
Fax: (514) 734-2713
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hopital General de Hawkesbury
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-1111
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Campbell D. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation/Campbell D. Davies Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davies ( CPSO# 70811 )

Business Address:
Hopital General de Hawkesbury
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
3830 Lacombe Avenue
Montreal QC  H3T 1M5
Phone Number: (514) 345-3511

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMPBELL DAVID DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1996