Davies, Ceri Jane (CPSO#: 63858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1A
6758 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1B 1G8
Phone: (416) 286-7890
Fax: (416) 286-8600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davies ( CPSO# 63858 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A
6758 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 1G8
Phone Number: (416) 286-7890

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CERI JANE DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992