Davies, Dafydd Alexander (CPSO#: 86052)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: IWK Health Centre 5850-5980 University Avenue PO Box 9700 Halifax, NS B3K 6R8
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Surgery Effective: 04 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 25 May 2007
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014