Davies, Edward George (CPSO#: 62451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 302
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-9051
Fax: (416) 438-9899
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward G. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Davies ( CPSO# 62451 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 438-9051

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Rouge Valley - Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Boniface Park Cardiac Diagnostic Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 431-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1992