Davies, Felicity Gail (CPSO#: 57458)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Storage 100 Piccadilly Street London, ON N6A 1Q8
Date Received: 08 May 2014


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014