Davies, Gregory Arthur Llewellyn (CPSO#: 60653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Queen's University
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6072
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1609 Stittsville Main
Stittsville ON  K2S 1N5
Canada
Phone: 613-714-1000
Fax: 613-728-1120
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Davies ( CPSO# 60653 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6072

Business Address:
Suite D
1609 Stittsville Main
Stittsville ON  K2S 1N5
Phone Number: (613) 714-1000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ARTHUR LLEWELLYN DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1992