Davies, Mary Patricia (CPSO#: 26353)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Health Centre 30 The Queensway Toronto, ON M6B 1B5
Date Received: 30 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2015