Davies, Norman James (CPSO#: 54724)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 19 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 19 Sep 1988