Davies, Richard Frederick (CPSO#: 50366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
40 Ruskin Street
H2247B
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7325
Fax: (613) 696-7134
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard F. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Langner ( CPSO# 31863 )
Dr. R. Davies ( CPSO# 50366 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
H2247B
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4729

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD FREDERICK DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1985