Davies, Sharon Rose (CPSO#: 50367)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Rose Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Hospital Department of Anesthesia 1001-522 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1W7
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017