Davignon, Genevieve (CPSO#: 85049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
100 Marie- Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Davignon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Davignon ( CPSO# 85049 )

Business Address:
300 - 100 Marie-Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE DAVIGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIGNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008