Davis, Darryl Raymond (CPSO#: 73676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darryl R. Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Davis ( CPSO# 73676 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Room 3214
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7298

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRYL RAYMOND DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004