Davis, George Edwin Donald (CPSO#: 13060)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Dec 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1950
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 14 Feb 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Oct 2000
Summary:

 On October 23, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Davis( plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant 
 to his suitability to practice which related to two charges of defrauding OHIP.

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered the following penalty:

1)	That Dr. Davis be reprimanded, the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the Register,
2)	That the Registrar suspend Dr. Davis( certificate of 
 registration for a period of three months, starting as of November 15, 2000, and ending as of 
 February 14, 2001;
3)	Dr. Davis is ordered to pay costs in the amount of $2,500.00 before November 
 15, 2000

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 23, 2000