Davis, Ian Ronald (CPSO#: 31377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN RONALD DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1980