Davis, Jayne Lee (CPSO#: 66877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 807
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 408-1010
Fax: (416) 408-2828
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAYNE LEE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 02 Apr 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1996