Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Davis, Kristian Alexander Macleod (CPSO#: 69037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Calabogie Medical Centre
P O Box 40
Calabogie ON  K0J 1H0
Phone: (613) 752-2323
Fax: (613) 752-2323
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristian Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Davis ( CPSO# 69037 )

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street South
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone Number: (613) 432-0911

Business Address:
Calabogie Medical Centre
1101 Francis Street
Calabogie ON  K0J 1H0
Phone Number: (613) 752-2323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIAN ALEXANDER MACLEOD DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2005