Davis, Meghan Colleen (CPSO#: 65144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8N 4R6
Phone: (905) 547-2302
Fax: (905) 548-9722
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meghan Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davis ( CPSO# 65144 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8N 4R6
Phone Number: (905) 547-2302

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHAN COLLEEN DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993