Davis, Michael Garson (CPSO#: 33464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 638-7226
Fax: (416) 638-0765
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael G. Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davis ( CPSO# 33464 )

Business Address:
103 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 638-7226

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GARSON DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1982