Davis, Neil Leonard (CPSO#: 91909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Pathology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Davis ( CPSO# 91909 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Pathology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 932-3300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 23 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Neil  Leonard  Davis  may  practise  medicine  independently in anatomical
            pathology, only.