Davis, Rodney Patrick (CPSO#: 22622)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Apr 2000
Summary:

On April 10, 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Davis guilty of professional misconduct 
in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in conduct or 
an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.   The 
Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1)    that Dr. Davis attend befored it to be reprimanded; 
2)    that the fact of this reprimand be recorded on the Register; 
3)    directs the Registrar to impose on Dr. Davis  certificate of registration a term, condition 
      and limitation that he be prohibited from prescribing the drugs on Schedule 1" to the 
      Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, with the exception of codeine 
4)    directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Davis  certificate of registration for a period of 12 
      months to commence on a date in June, 2000, to be fixed by the Registrar; 
5)    that 9 months of the 12 month suspension shall be suspended, provided that  
      a)    Dr. Davis sends a letter to the Director of the Bureau of Drug Surveillance, Health 
            Canada, voluntarily giving up his prescribing privileges in respect of the drugs on 
            Schedule 1" to the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, with the exception of 
            codeine, and provides proof to the Registrar that he has sent such letter; 
      b)    Dr. Davis shall agree to and co-operate in inspections of his practice by an 
            inspector appointed by the Registrar, at his own expense, to review and report to 
            the Registrar on: 
            i)    The quality of his record keeping, 
            ii)   The appropriateness of referrals to specialists, 
            iii)  The quality of care to his patients as demonstrated by his medical records. 
                         
            Such inspections shall take place at the end of six months after his resumption of 
            his medical practice following his three month suspension, and for three years 
            thereafter, on or about the twelve month anniversary date of the first inspection 
            and each inspection thereafter; 
 
      c)    Dr. Davis understands and agrees that the Registrar may take such action as he 
            considers appropriate on the basis of the inspection reports that he receives; 
 
6)    The Committee orders that Dr. Davis shall pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the 
      amount of $2,000.00 on or before May 1, 2000, and that Dr. Davis shall provide proof of 
      this payment to the Registrar of the College. 
 
 
 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Apr 2000


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Jun 1993
Summary:

In June 1993, Dr. Davis pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as 
amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an 
act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).    The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
found Dr. Davis guilty of professional misconduct.    Consequently, for the offence of disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional conduct, the Committee ordered that Dr. Davis be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded 
on the Register, and that he be fined the sum of $5000.00.    This fine was to be suspended on the condition that no further 
convictions of this nature were recorded against Dr. Davis.    For the offense of sexual impropriety, the Committee imposed the 
following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Davis was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. 
 
   2. Dr. Davis' licence was to be suspended for a period of twelve months, with ten months of the suspension to be 
      themselves suspended if the following conditions were met: 
 
      (a) He was to embark upon, and complete to the satisfaction of the Registrar, a program directed toward victim 
          empathy and sensitization, and relapse prevention.    Dr. Davis was to enrol in such a program by 1 
          September 1993, and to complete it by 31 March 1994. 
 
      (b) He was to undertake to have a female third party, employed by him or provided by the patient, present 
          whenever a female patient was to be examined.    This undertaking was to take effect within thirty days, but 
          would no longer be required as a condition once the program, outlined in section 2(a) above, was completed. 
 
      (c) Dr. Davis was to continue in psychotherapy with his present therapist, or an alternate therapist acceptable to 
          the Registrar, until such time as the therapist advised the Registrar, to the Registrar's satisfaction, that such 
          therapy was no longer necessary, with reports to be sent semi-annually to the Registrar indicating compliance 
          with the program outline above in section 2(a), and providing assurance to the Registrar that Dr. Davis posed 
          no threat to the public. 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 16 Jun 1993


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Dec 1976
Summary:

 In December 1976, Dr. Davis pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and 
 without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of 
 an examination or treatment performed by him, contrary to s. 26(26); and in that he engaged in 
 conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31).  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. 
 Davis guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Davis be 
 reprimanded, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of two weeks.  The 
 Committee also accepted Dr. Davis( undertaking to  reimburse his patients for financial loss 
 suffered as a result of his failure to provide a report, stipulating that failure to fulfil this 
 commitment to the satisfaction of the College within thirty days would result in suspension of his 
 licence for an additional one month.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Dec 1976

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: December 31, 2003
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 31, 2003, Dr. Rodney Patrick Davis signed the following undertaking:

1. I hereby confirm that I intend to retire from active practice and resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.

2. I have no intentions to apply for registration as a physician or for a license to practice medicine in any other jurisdiction.

3. I consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.

4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario has agreed to withdraw the allegations of professional misconduct that are currently pending before the Discipline Committee.

I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking.

On January 19, 2004, the College withdrew the allegations against Dr. Davis.