Davison, Kelly (CPSO#: 89775)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2011 to 13 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2013