Davison, Sara Nicola (CPSO#: 67697)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 31 Oct 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 1994 to 31 May 1994
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2001