Davoudpour, Mohammadreza (CPSO#: 108896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A202
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0K7
Phone: (905) 884-6500
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Davoudpour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davoudpour ( CPSO# 108896)

Business Address:
Unit A202
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0K7
Phone Number: (905) 884-6500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMADREZA DAVOUDPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVOUDPOUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2017