Daw, Zohra Mohamed Ahmed (CPSO#: 76796)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007