Dawar, Meenakshi (CPSO#: 66916)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2003