Dawdy, John Alden (CPSO#: 59417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1355 Bank Street
Suite 502
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc BLVD
Orleans ON  K1C6V8
Canada
Phone: 6137495421
Fax: 6138308211
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Dawdy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dawdy ( CPSO# 59417 )

Business Address:
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-1584

Business Address:
23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc
Orleans ON  K1C 6V8
Phone Number: (613) 830-8211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ALDEN DAWDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989