Dawe, Ian Craig (CPSO#: 66917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2200 Ext. 6971
Fax: 905-813-1594
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN CRAIG DAWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1998