Dawes, Peter David (CPSO#: 77319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
87 Morrison Lane
New London PE  C1N 3N9
Phone: (902) 886-2769
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Dawes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 1 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DAVID DAWES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2012