Dawood, Mahomed Rayhaan (CPSO#: 107027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Michigan State University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Weber Street North
Waterloo ON  N2J 3G8
Phone: 5197464344
Fax: 5197463334
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dawood ( CPSO# 107027)
Dr. M. Dawood ( CPSO# 74142 )

Business Address:
Suite 902
570 University Avenue East
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 570-1280


Corporation Name: Mahomed Rayhaan Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dawood ( CPSO# 107027)

Business Address:
110 Weber Street North
Waterloo ON  N2J 3G8
Phone Number: (519) 746-4344

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHOMED RAYHAAN DAWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWOOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017