Dawson, Heather Rose (CPSO#: 50370)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2000