Dawson, Laura Ann (CPSO#: 66716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: Davison, Laura Ann (used until: 11 Sep 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Radiation Medicine Program
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2132
Fax: (416) 946-6566
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Ann Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dawson ( CPSO# 66716 )

Business Address:
Radiation Medicine Program
UHN- Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2127

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANN DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2003