Dawson, Stephen Thomas (CPSO#: 50371)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 09 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 09 May 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 May 2005
Summary:

 On May 9, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Stephen Thomas Dawson committed 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of  a patient.  On May 9, 2005, the 
 Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Dawson(s certificate of registration be 
 revoked, effectively immediately.

2.	Dr. Dawson appear before the panel to be reprimanded and the 
 fact of the reprimand be recorded in the register.

3.	Dr. Dawson pay costs to the College in the 
 amount of $2,500 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 09, 2005

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 06 Dec 2012
Decision: Application Denied