Dawson, Susan Patricia (CPSO#: 65376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 0G1
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dawson ( CPSO# 65376 )

Business Address:
Unit A - 1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 254-9777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN PATRICIA DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993