Day, Anna (CPSO#: 29302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7346
Fax: (416) 323-7550
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

491 Lawrence Avenue West #201
Toronto ON  M5M1C7
Canada
Phone: 416 2560600
Fax: 416 2560602
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Day Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Day ( CPSO# 29302 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7346

Business Address:
Suite 201 & 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA DAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1977