Day, Laurence Linn (CPSO#: 23031)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Temple University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007