Day, Leigh Ann (CPSO#: 81228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-3311
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leigh Day Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Day ( CPSO# 81228 )

Business Address:
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEIGH ANN DAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006