Dayes, Ian Stuart (CPSO#: 69113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Radiation Oncology
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Dayes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Dayes ( CPSO# 69113 )

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN STUART DAYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAYES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2001