Dayian, Vahe Robert (CPSO#: 58215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2636 West Walnut Street
Garland TX  75042
United States
Phone: (972) 487-5800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 24, 2015, the following voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking,
            Acknowledgement and Consent by Dr. Vahe Robert Dayian is imposed as a term,
            condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dayian:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. VAHE ROBERT DAYIAN
                                          ("Dr. Dayian")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            _______________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Dayian, certificate of registration number 58215, am a member of
                  the College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the
                  requirement to participate in a program of continuing professional
                  development.    

            (2)   I, Dr. Dayian, am currently not practicing medicine in Ontario.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Dayian, undertake to the College that, effective immediately, I
                  will not practise medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the
                  following conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (4)   I, Dr. Dayian, undertake to the College that upon signing this
                  Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the
                  Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") that my billing number be
                  deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and
                  before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the terms of this Undertaking. If I do not have an active
                  Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") billing number, I undertake to
                  provide proof of same to the College.

            (5)   I, Dr. Dayian, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the
                  College's Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who
                  Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their
                  Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                  Appendix "A".  I also undertake to abide by the College's Policy on
                  Physicians Re-entering Practice, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                  Appendix "B". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (6)   I, Dr. Dayian, acknowledge that in exchange for this Undertaking, the
                  College has agreed to take no further action in relation to my failure to
                  participate in a program of continuing professional development.

            (7)   I, Dr. Dayian, acknowledge and agree that in considering my request to
                  return to practice, the Registrar may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and

                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.

            (8)   I, Dr. Dayian, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Dayian, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Dayian, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Dayian, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.


            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Dayian, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may
                  have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Dayian, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.