Dayot-Venida, Madeline (CPSO#: 52012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brookdale Plaza
Unit 4
871 - 875 Chemong Road
Peterborough ON  K9H 5Z5
Phone: (705) 743-0152
Fax: (705) 743-0152
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Madeline Dayot-Venida Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dayot-Venida ( CPSO# 52012 )

Business Address:
871-875 Chemong Road
Brookdale Plaza
Unit 4
Peterborough ON  K9H 5Z5
Phone Number: (705) 743-0152

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADELINE DAYOT-VENIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAYOT-VENIDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1985