Ddungu, Henry (CPSO#: 78404)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Makerere Univ, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 11 Nov 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 12 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2005